THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 4:00:48 AM
Al-Omi, Mohammed Nasser Mohammed
CPSO#:
92328
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of
30 Jun 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
30 Jan 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: King Saud University, Riyadh College of, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jan 2010 to 26 Feb 2010
PEAP - CF - Nephrology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 27 Feb 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
CF - Nephrology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jan 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
CF - Nephrology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jan 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Nephrology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Nephrology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 27 Feb 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 29 Jan 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 30 Jan 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2013 |