THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 5:39:18 AM
Naqvi, Syed Ahmed Saeed
CPSO#:
92326
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
30 Jun 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
06 Mar 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Sind Medical College, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Pakistan
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2010 to 25 Mar 2010
PEAP - CF - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 26 Mar 2010 to 25 Mar 2011
CF - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 26 Mar 2011 to 25 Mar 2012
CF - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 26 Mar 2012 to 25 Mar 2013
CF - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 26 Mar 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 05 Mar 2015
CF - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 06 Mar 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 06 Mar 2016
CF - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 07 Mar 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 06 Mar 2017
CF - General Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 07 Mar 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - General Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 06 Mar 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2017 |