THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 6:50:11 AM
Blunt, Danielle Nicole
CPSO#:
92295
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
13 Dec 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
11 Oct 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: The Flinders Univ of South Australia, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Australia
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 03 Dec 2009 to 16 Dec 2009
PEAP - R - Internal Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 17 Dec 2009 to 29 Jan 2010
EL - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2016 to 10 Oct 2016
PEAP - CF - Hematology
University of Toronto, 11 Oct 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Hematology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Aug 2017
CF - Hematology
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Hematology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 31 Aug 2018
CF - Hematology
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2018 to 13 Dec 2018
CF - Hematology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 03 Dec 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 16 Dec 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 Dec 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 29 Jan 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 06 Sep 2016 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Oct 2016 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 13 Dec 2018 |