THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 1:22:30 AM
Morrison, Allan Fairchild
CPSO#:
92284
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
20 Jan 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
20 Jan 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Ross University School of Medicine, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Chatham Kent Family Health Team
Blenheim Medical Centre
30 Chatham Street North
Blenheim ON N0P 1A0
Phone: (519) 676-5592
Fax: (866) 539-6714
Electoral District: 01
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:20 Jan 2011 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Dec 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
EL - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Dec 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 20 Jan 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 05 May 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Sep 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Sep 2014 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Sep 2014 |
|
Active |