THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 0:26:43 AM
Takrouri, Heba Sadeq Rabah
CPSO#:
92281
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 May 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 May 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: University of Jordan, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
McMaster Children's Hospital
Department of Radiology
1200 Main St W
Hamilton ON L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 75298
Electoral District: 04
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Jordan
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:01 Jul 2018 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 23 Nov 2009 to 03 Feb 2010
PEAP - CF - Paediatric Radiology
University of Toronto, 04 Feb 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Paediatric Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
CF - Paediatric Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 23 Nov 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Feb 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 May 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 22 Dec 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2018 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 22 Mar 2019 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 22 Mar 2019 |
|
Active |