THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 9:07:31 AM
Langevin, Melissa Kathleen
CPSO#:
92269
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
31 Jul 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
31 Jul 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of Eastern ON
Division of Paediatric
Emergency Medicine
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MELISSA KATHLEEN LANGEVIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LANGEVIN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Emergency Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pediatric Emergency Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 29 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pediatric Emergency Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Nov 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 20 Dec 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 29 Jul 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Jul 2013 |