THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 19:03:19 PM
Abeysinghe, Nilanga
CPSO#:
92265
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
08 Feb 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Feb 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Abeysinghe, Abeysinghe Mudiyanselage Nilanga (used until: 31 Oct 2010 )
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Sinhala
Education: University of Colombo, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1500 Fisher Street
North Bay ON P1B 2H3
Phone: 7054742106
Fax: 7054746613
Electoral District: 08
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
North Bay Regional Health Centre |
North Bay |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:09 Jan 2012 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NILANGA ABEYSINGHE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABEYSINGHE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 16 Nov 2009 to 07 Feb 2010
AVP - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 08 Feb 2010 to 16 Jan 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 17 Jan 2011 to 16 Jan 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 16 Nov 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 08 Feb 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 16 Jan 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Feb 2012 |