THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 5:52:16 AM
Skeate, Robert Charles
CPSO#:
92263
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
28 May 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
13 Nov 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Minnesota, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Canadian Blood Services
67 College Street
Toronto ON M5G 2M1
Date Received: 02 Jun 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 13 Nov 2009 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Nov 2009 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 12 May 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 Apr 2011 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 07 Apr 2011 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 28 May 2022 |