THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 18:52:46 PM
Cathers, Christopher Royden
CPSO#:
92259
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Dec 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Dec 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Saba University School of Medicine, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 201
66 Josephine Street
North Bay ON P1B 0A7
Phone: (705) 495-2685
Fax: 7054954128
Electoral District: 08
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
North Bay Regional Health Centre |
North Bay |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:14 Dec 2011 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER ROYDEN CATHERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CATHERS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 16 Nov 2009 to 07 Feb 2010
AVP - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 08 Feb 2010 to 15 Nov 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 16 Nov 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 20 Nov 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 16 Nov 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 07 Feb 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 09 Feb 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 20 Nov 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Dec 2011 |