THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 6:12:03 AM
Alshamari, Shoaa Farhan Theyeb
CPSO#:
92253
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
30 Jun 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
04 Nov 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: King Faisal University, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 03 Nov 2009 to 25 Jan 2010
PEAP - CF - Neurology
University of Toronto, 26 Jan 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 03 Nov 2015
CF - Neurology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 10 Nov 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jan 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Nov 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2015 |