THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 6:46:38 AM
Kycia, Katarzyna
CPSO#:
92252
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
22 Jun 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
15 Jan 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:PO Box 22133, Pollard Meadows, Edmonton, AB T6L 0A1
Date Received: 22 Jun 2015
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:08 Jan 2010 |
CFPC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 16 Nov 2009 to 27 Dec 2009
EL - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Nov 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 27 Dec 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jan 2010 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 22 Jun 2015 |