THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 14:16:39 PM
Matthews, Nicola Elizabeth
CPSO#:
92236
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
31 Aug 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
31 Aug 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Lennox and Addington County
General Hospital
8 Richmond Park Drive
Napanee ON K7R 2Z4
Phone: (613) 354-3301 Ext. 481
Fax: 6133548244
Electoral District: 06
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Manitoba
Nunavut
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kingston Health Sciences Centre |
Kingston |
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital |
Napanee |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:07 May 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
General Internal Medicine |
Effective:27 Sep 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NICOLA ELIZABETH MATTHEWS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MATTHEWS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 02 Nov 2009 to 27 Nov 2009
EL - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Nov 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 27 Nov 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Aug 2017 |