THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 18:34:22 PM
Chakravarti, Neetu
CPSO#:
92227
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Aug 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Aug 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu
Education: American University of the Caribbean, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Peelmed
475 Charolais Blvd
Brampton ON L6Y 0M2
Phone: (905) 4543347
Fax: (905) 4543288
Electoral District: 05
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Wisconsin
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:09 Jun 2010 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NEETU CHAKRAVARTI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAKRAVARTI is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 27 Oct 2009 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 27 Oct 2009 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 26 Oct 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Aug 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Aug 2010 |
Concerns
Source:
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: May 4, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
As of January 27, 2017, Dr. Chakravarti has completed all elements of this SCERP.
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.
Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)