THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 8:21:03 AM
Akinlosotu, Adewale Anthony
CPSO#:
92222
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
04 Feb 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Feb 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hausa, Yoruba
Education: Obafemi Awolowo University, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 102
860 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor ON N8X 2S5
Phone: (519) 567-3323
Fax: (226) 221-8383
Electoral District: 01
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Ireland
Nigeria
United Kingdom
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare |
Windsor |
Windsor Regional Hospital |
Windsor |
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus |
Windsor |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:03 May 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ADEWALE ANTHONY AKINLOSOTU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AKINLOSOTU is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 26 Oct 2009 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 26 Oct 2009 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 05 Feb 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 27 Jul 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 25 Oct 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 08 Nov 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 Oct 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 Oct 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 04 Feb 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Feb 2014 |