THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 6:24:27 AM
Beard, Jonathan Daryl
CPSO#:
92213
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
20 Oct 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
20 Oct 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Ross University School of Medicine, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Partners
Child & Adolescent Mental Health
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-4421
Fax: (905) 813-1594
Electoral District: 05
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital |
Mississauga |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:20 Oct 2009 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry |
Effective:07 Mar 2013 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 20 Oct 2009 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 20 Oct 2009 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 19 Apr 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Feb 2011 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 11 Feb 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 Mar 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Sep 2016 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Sep 2016 |
|
Active |