THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 10:04:09 AM
Waddington, Ashley
CPSO#:
92211
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Aug 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Jun 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Dept of Obstetrics & Gynaecology
Victory 4
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 548 6069
Fax: 613 548 1330
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kingston Health Sciences Centre |
Kingston |
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital |
Napanee |
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority |
Moose Factory |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:29 Jul 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ASHLEY WADDINGTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WADDINGTON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 26 Oct 2009 to 23 Nov 2009
EL - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Queen's University, 15 Aug 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 26 Oct 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 23 Nov 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Aug 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jun 2013 |