THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 3:01:46 AM
Rahman, Shafiur
CPSO#:
92205
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 Jan 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
02 Jan 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Bengali, English
Education: University of Chittagong, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1135 Adelaide St N
London ON N5Y 5K7
Phone: (519) 438-4500
Fax: (519) 438-4504
Electoral District: 02
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:02 Jan 2017 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 20 Oct 2009 to 12 Jan 2010
AVP - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 13 Jan 2010 to 20 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 21 Oct 2010 to 19 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 20 Oct 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jan 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 19 Oct 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 03 May 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Apr 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Jul 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 26 Feb 2016 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Sep 2016 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 02 Jan 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 02 Jan 2017 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 14 Jun 2018 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 14 Jun 2018 |
|
Active |