THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 8:40:59 AM
Scott, Andrea Dianne
CPSO#:
92204
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
31 Oct 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
24 Jan 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: University College, Cork, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2009 to 23 Jan 2010
AVP - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 24 Jan 2010 to 31 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2010 to 31 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Nov 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jan 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Oct 2011 |