THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 11:29:10 AM
Gangani, Asmitha
CPSO#:
92184
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
16 Feb 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
16 Feb 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Gujarati, Hindi, Kannada, Russian, Tamil, Urdu
Education: Kazakh State Medical University, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Oak Ridges Medical and Urgent Care
Centre
Suite 100
13291 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON L4E 4L6
Phone: (905) 773-7759
Fax: (905) 773-1325
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:14 Dec 2011 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ASMITHA GANGANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GANGANI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 20 Oct 2009 to 11 Jan 2010
AVP - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 12 Jan 2010 to 10 Jan 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 11 Jan 2011 to 10 Jan 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 20 Oct 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jan 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 10 Jan 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Feb 2012 |