THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 17:00:40 PM
Patasi, Beata
CPSO#:
92183
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 Feb 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
02 Feb 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Czech, English, Hungarian, Russian, Slovak
Education: Univerzita Komenskeho,Bratislava, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
B-6 Harvey St
Chatham ON N7M 1L6
Phone: 18889306571
Fax: 18559672945
Electoral District: 01
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: B. Patasi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 19 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:14 Dec 2011 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BEATA PATASI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATASI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 20 Oct 2009 to 08 Feb 2010
AVP - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 09 Feb 2010 to 11 Nov 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 12 Nov 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 21 Nov 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 20 Oct 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 09 Feb 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 21 Nov 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Feb 2012 |