THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 1:42:53 AM
Archambault-Leger, Stephanie
CPSO#:
92160
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
06 Jul 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
09 Feb 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Quebec
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:09 Dec 2009 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 02 Oct 2009 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 02 Oct 2009 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 01 Oct 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Feb 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Feb 2010 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 06 Jul 2020 |