THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 1:41:03 AM
Newman, Dana Ethel
CPSO#:
92155
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Oct 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Oct 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hebrew, Spanish
Education: Ben-Gurion University of the Negev Facul, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Health Centre
Family Medicine Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6860
Fax: (416) 530-6160
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto |
Toronto |
Women's College Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:05 Oct 2011 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DANA ETHEL NEWMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NEWMAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 05 Oct 2009 to 27 Dec 2009
AVP - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 28 Dec 2009 to 04 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 05 Oct 2010 to 04 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 31 Oct 2011 to 29 Jan 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Obstetrics)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 05 Oct 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 28 Dec 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 04 Oct 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Oct 2011 |