THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 8:38:13 AM
Machnowska, Matylda Hanna
CPSO#:
92153
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Apr 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Polish
Education: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Medical Imaging
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MATYLDA HANNA MACHNOWSKA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACHNOWSKA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 06 Oct 2009 to 30 Oct 2009
EL - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 05 Jul 2010 to 30 Jul 2010
EL - Neuroradiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neuroradiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 7 - Neuroradiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 06 Oct 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Oct 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jul 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jul 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Apr 2013 |