THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 13:05:48 PM
Chasen, Martin Robert
CPSO#:
92146
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
04 Jun 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Jun 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Afrikaans, English, French
Education: University of Pretoria School of Medicin, 1983
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Brampton Civic Hospital
Division of Palliative Care
2100 Bovaird Drive east
Brampton
Brampton ON L6R 3J7
Phone: 905-494-2120 Ext. 50532
Fax: 905-494-6758
Electoral District: 05
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Quebec
South Africa
United Kingdom
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness |
Brampton |
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital |
Brampton |
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Medical Oncology |
Effective:18 Nov 2009 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Palliative Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 2016 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARTIN ROBERT CHASEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHASEN is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 28 Sep 2009 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 28 Sep 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 04 Jun 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jun 2014 |