THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 10:10:09 AM
Yahmad, Nagib Yahya Ramadan
CPSO#:
92145
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
09 Aug 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Aug 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicin, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Health Plus
Unit 3
640 Eglinton Avenue
Mississauga ON L5R 3V2
Phone: (905) 268-0520
Fax: (905) 268-0521
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurology |
Effective:27 May 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NAGIB YAHYA RAMADAN YAHMAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YAHMAD is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 08 Aug 2011 to 30 Oct 2011
PEAP - CF - Neurology
University of Toronto, 31 Oct 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 07 Aug 2012
CF - Neurology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 29 Sep 2009 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 29 Sep 2009 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 28 Sep 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Aug 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Aug 2010 |