THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 6:52:55 AM
Sivapalan, Shivajan
CPSO#:
92139
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Nov 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Nov 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: St. George's University School of Medici, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2000 Simcoe Street North
Campus Health Clinic
Oshawa ON L1H 7K4
Phone: 905-721-3037
Fax: 905-721-3133
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:05 Oct 2011 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SHIVAJAN SIVAPALAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIVAPALAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 05 Oct 2009 to 27 Dec 2009
AVP - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 28 Dec 2009 to 04 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 05 Oct 2010 to 04 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 05 Oct 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 28 Dec 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 04 Oct 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Nov 2011 |