THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 6:00:19 AM
Viswabandya, Auro
CPSO#:
92121
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 Apr 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
23 Apr 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Bengali, English, Hindi, Oriya
Education: Utkal University, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
UHN Princess Margaret Hospital
Department of Medical Oncology
and Hematology
Room 6-323 700 University Ave
Toronto ON M5G 1X9
Phone: (416) 946-4501 Ext. 3256
Fax: (416) 946-4407
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Hematology |
Effective:01 Jul 2019 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 2019 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2009 to 08 Dec 2009
PEAP - CF - Hematology
University of Toronto, 09 Dec 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Hematology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Hematology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Hematology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 09 Dec 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 23 Apr 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 25 Apr 2017 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2019 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Feb 2024 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Feb 2024 |
|
Active |