THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 22:06:01 PM
Halbert, Cyril Franklyn
CPSO#:
92120
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of
30 Nov 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
07 Dec 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: Georgetown University, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2009 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Sep 2009 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 22 Mar 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Jun 2010 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 05 Aug 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 20 Sep 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Mar 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 22 Aug 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 07 Dec 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 20 Mar 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Sep 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 27 Sep 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Nov 2013 |