THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 5:56:39 AM
Riyaz, Rehan Rahim
CPSO#:
92107
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
24 Jul 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
30 Jun 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:30 Jun 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 28 Sep 2009 to 16 Oct 2009
EL - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 09 May 2011 to 20 May 2011
EL - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 18 Jun 2012 to 29 Jun 2012
EL - Ophthalmology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 28 Sep 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 16 Oct 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 09 May 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 20 May 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jun 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 29 Jun 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2012 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 24 Jul 2013 |