THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 9:45:10 AM
Barrett, Lisa
CPSO#:
92082
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of
14 Aug 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
10 Aug 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:09 Aug 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 10 Aug 2009 to 09 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Infectious Diseases
University of Toronto, 10 Aug 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 09 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 10 Sep 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Aug 2010 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 14 Aug 2014 |