THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 9:46:38 AM
Bokore, Wasira George
CPSO#:
92076
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
04 Nov 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Nov 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Swahili
Education: University of Dar Es Salaam, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1-306 Rexdale Blvd
Etobicoke ON M9W 1R6
Phone: 4163425140
Fax: 4163425148
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:13 Oct 2010 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. WASIRA GEORGE BOKORE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOKORE is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 08 Sep 2009 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 08 Sep 2009 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 16 Jul 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jul 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 04 Nov 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Nov 2010 |