THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 8:37:03 AM
Sampaio, Marcos Loreto
CPSO#:
92075
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
04 Sep 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
04 Sep 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Portuguese
Education: University of Sao Paulo, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Department of Medical Imaging
L2121, CPCR building
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8571
Fax: (613) 737-8830
Electoral District: 07
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Brazil
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Arnprior Regional Health |
Arnprior |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site |
Ottawa |
Renfrew Victoria Hospital |
Renfrew |
Winchester District Memorial Hospital |
Winchester |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:04 Sep 2009 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 04 Sep 2009 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 04 Sep 2009 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 01 Sep 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 Jul 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 26 Aug 2016 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 26 Aug 2016 |
|
Active |