THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 8:55:32 AM
Baryla, Yuliya
CPSO#:
92069
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
20 Jan 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Jan 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Russian
Education: Belarusian State Medical University, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Leaside Health Centre
795 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto ON M4G 4E4
Phone: (416) 424-3145
Fax: (416) 424-2611
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Yuliya Baryla Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 17 2024
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:16 Dec 2009 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. YULIYA BARYLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARYLA is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 03 Sep 2009 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 03 Sep 2009 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 02 Sep 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 20 Jan 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jan 2010 |