THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 1:49:49 AM
Zurita Macias Valadez, Luis Cristobal
CPSO#:
92065
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
30 Jun 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
25 Aug 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: Universidad Autonoma De Ciudad Juarez, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Sep 2009 to 14 Sep 2009
PEAP - R - General Surgery
McMaster University, 15 Sep 2009 to 30 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 24 Aug 2011
PEAP - CF - General Surgery
McMaster University, 25 Aug 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Sep 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Sep 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 25 Aug 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2013 |