THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 7:54:33 AM
Peebles, Erin Rachelle
CPSO#:
92042
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
05 May 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 May 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Peebles Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 20 2021
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:London Health Sciences Centre, Health Records
800 Commissioners Rd. East, London ON N6A 5W9
Date Received: 05 May 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 31 Aug 2009 to 25 Sep 2009
EL - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 07 Mar 2011 to 04 Apr 2011
EL - Paediatric Critical Care
University of Toronto, 26 Sep 2011 to 23 Oct 2011
EL - Paediatric Critical Care
McMaster University, 24 Oct 2011 to 18 Nov 2011
EL - Paediatric Nephrology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Critical Care
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 31 Aug 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 25 Sep 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 07 Mar 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 04 Apr 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 26 Sep 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 18 Nov 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 May 2013 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 05 May 2021 |