THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 2:04:51 AM
Gasiorowska, Paulina Maria
CPSO#:
92037
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Jul 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Jul 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French, German, Polish
Education: University of British Columbia Faculty o, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
lyte medical resources
30 commercial road east york
m4g1z4
Toronto ON M3M 0B2
Phone: (416) 249-8111
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
British Columbia
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2010 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:27 Oct 2011 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PAULINA MARIA GASIOROWSKA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GASIOROWSKA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 24 Aug 2009 to 20 Sep 2009
EL - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 25 Aug 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 20 Sep 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jul 2011 |