THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 17:37:08 PM
Hosseini Moghaddam, Seyed Mohammadmehdi
CPSO#:
92031
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jun 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Jun 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi
Education: BABOL UNIVERSITY OF HEALTH SCIENCES, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
585 University Ave
Toronto ON M5G 2N2
Phone: 4163404800 Ext. 6835
Fax: 4163405442
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
St Joseph's Health Care, London |
London |
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Infectious Diseases |
Effective:29 Nov 2017 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2009 to 18 Nov 2009
PEAP - CF - Infectious Diseases
University of Toronto, 19 Nov 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Infectious Diseases
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 14 Jun 2011
CF - Infectious Diseases
University of Toronto, 15 Jun 2011 to 01 Jan 2012
CF - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 02 Jan 2012 to 31 May 2012
CF - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 19 Nov 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 May 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jun 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 May 2017 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 29 Nov 2017 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 29 Nov 2017 |
|
Active |