THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 22:29:49 PM
Wiebe, Dale Jason Paul
CPSO#:
92021
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
12 Aug 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 Aug 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Manitoba, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
TrueNorth Medical Centre
24 Dalhousie Street
2nd floor
Toronto ON M5B 2A5
Phone: (888) 878-3563
Fax: (416) 981-8939
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:16 Dec 2010 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DALE JASON PAUL WIEBE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WIEBE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 24 Aug 2009 to 06 Sep 2009
EL - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Aug 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 06 Sep 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jan 2011 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 11 Aug 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Aug 2016 |