THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 6:53:05 AM
Rasasingham, Rajeevan
CPSO#:
92014
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
06 Jun 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
06 Jun 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Ross University School of Medicine, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Humber River Regional Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON M3M 0B2
Phone: (416) 242-1000 Ext. 43153
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - West Virginia
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Humber River Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:03 May 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RAJEEVAN RASASINGHAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RASASINGHAM is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 19 Aug 2009 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 19 Aug 2009 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 18 Aug 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 06 Jun 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jun 2012 |