THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 21:30:31 PM
Rizvi, Syed Mohammad Hussain
CPSO#:
91997
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Aug 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
17 Aug 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Urdu
Education: University of Karachi, 1987
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
3630 Lawrence Ave E
Cedarbrae Medical Center
Scarborough ON M1G 1P6
Phone: 416-901-6370
Fax: 647 689 3546
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare |
Windsor |
Windsor Regional Hospital |
Windsor |
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus |
Windsor |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:17 Aug 2009 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 17 Aug 2009 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 Aug 2009 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 16 Feb 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Aug 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 May 2011 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 25 May 2011 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 May 2011 |
|
Active |