THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 9:11:09 AM
Fernandez, Luis Alberto
CPSO#:
91970
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
29 Oct 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
04 Aug 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: Universidad Central De Venezuela, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Aug 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 17 Sep 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Sep 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 29 Oct 2009 |