THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 13:47:30 PM
Pozdnyakov, Sergey Borisovich
CPSO#:
91962
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
31 Dec 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
24 Oct 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Arkhangelsk State Medical University, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:03 Jun 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 04 Aug 2009 to 23 Oct 2009
AVP - Anatomical Pathology
McMaster University, 24 Oct 2009 to 03 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology
McMaster University, 04 Aug 2010 to 03 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology
McMaster University, 04 Aug 2011 to 03 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology
McMaster University, 04 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 04 Aug 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Oct 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2015 |