THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 4:36:45 AM
Habib, Wasif Muhammad
CPSO#:
91961
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of
27 Jun 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
04 Jan 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: National University of Sci & Technology, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 04 Aug 2009 to 26 Oct 2009
AVP - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 27 Oct 2009 to 03 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 04 Aug 2010 to 03 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 04 Aug 2011 to 03 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 04 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 03 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 04 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 28 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 04 Aug 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 27 Oct 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 Jul 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 22 Sep 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 04 Jan 2018 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 27 Jun 2018 |