THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 6:19:08 AM
Debretsion, Tadese Fesehaye
CPSO#:
91948
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
03 Aug 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 Aug 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Amharic, English, Tigrigna
Education: Addis Ababa University, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1111 ALBION ROAD
SIUTE G7
Etobicoke ON M9V 1A9
Phone: 416 749 9400
Fax: 416 749 6880
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:25 Jul 2011 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. TADESE FESEHAYE DEBRETSION may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEBRETSION is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2009 to 23 Oct 2009
AVP - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 24 Oct 2009 to 31 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Oct 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Jul 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Aug 2011 |