THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 18:58:58 PM
Virmani, Vivek
CPSO#:
91946
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
08 Aug 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
01 Jul 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Aligarh Muslim University, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:11 Jun 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2009 to 12 Sep 2009
PEAP - CF - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 13 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 12 Sep 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Sep 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 08 Aug 2013 |