THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 17:16:27 PM
Hanna, Bassem Matta Nashed
CPSO#:
91944
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Mar 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Mar 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Mackenzie Health
10 Trench St
Richmond Hill ON L4C 4Z3
Phone: 4165484039
Fax: 6477225440
Electoral District: 05
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Egypt
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Mackenzie Health |
Richmond Hill |
Markham Stouffville Hospital |
Markham |
Quinte Health Care,Trenton Memorial |
Trenton |
Quinte Healthcare Corporation |
Belleville |
Southlake Regional Health Centre |
Newmarket |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery |
Effective:31 Jul 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BASSEM MATTA NASHED HANNA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HANNA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2009 to 22 Oct 2009
AVP - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
University of Ottawa, 23 Oct 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2011 to 31 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Oct 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Jul 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Mar 2019 |