THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 14:20:36 PM
Muhammad, Amin Ali
CPSO#:
91940
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
07 May 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
07 May 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Gujarati, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Sindhi, Urdu
Education: University of Karachi, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St. Catharines General Hospital
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON L2S 0A9
Phone: (905) 378-4647
Fax: 289-398-1067
Electoral District: 04
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Ireland
Newfoundland and Labrador
Pakistan
United Kingdom
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site |
St Catharines |
Toronto East Health Network |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:08 Mar 2019 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. AMIN ALI MUHAMMAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUHAMMAD is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 04 Aug 2009 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 04 Aug 2009 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 06 Oct 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 May 2010 |