THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 2:32:36 AM
Zlatescu, Magdalena Cecilia
CPSO#:
91932
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
31 Aug 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
25 Oct 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Medicine and Pharmacy, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Aug 2009 to 24 Oct 2009
AVP - Neurology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 25 Oct 2009 to 01 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 02 Aug 2010 to 01 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 02 Aug 2011 to 01 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 02 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 01 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 02 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 01 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 02 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Neurology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Aug 2015
CF - Neurology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 25 Oct 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Aug 2015 |