THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 14:20:07 PM
Vornberger, William James
CPSO#:
91917
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 Jul 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
24 Jul 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: St. George's University School of Medici, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
London Road Diagnostic Clinic
481 London Road
Sarnia ON N7T 4X3
Phone: (519) 336-0339
Electoral District: 01
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: W. Vornberger Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 10 2018
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 24 Jul 2009 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Jul 2009 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 23 Jan 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Jan 2011 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 11 Jan 2011 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Jan 2011 |
|
Active |
Concerns
Source:
Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: January 19, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Effective September 23, 2019, Dr. Vornberger has completed all elements of this SCERP.
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)