THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 8:23:19 AM
Nadarajah, Jayanthini
CPSO#:
91913
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
25 Aug 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 Aug 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Saba University School of Medicine, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Royal Victoria Hospital
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON L4M 6M2
Phone: (705) 728-9090
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre |
Barrie |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:02 Jun 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JAYANTHINI NADARAJAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NADARAJAH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2009 to 23 Oct 2009
AVP - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 24 Oct 2009 to 31 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2010 to 31 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2011 to 30 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 31 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 23 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Oct 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 23 Sep 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 31 Oct 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 25 Aug 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Aug 2015 |